This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/24/2023 at 01:03:47 (UTC).

SEAN ROONEY V. KB HOME, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 SEAN ROONEY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary G. Jolley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mary G. Jolley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEAN ROONEY

FLORIN ROEBIG P A

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendants

KB HOME

Wilmington, DE 19808

KB HOME FLORIDA LLC

Tallahassee, FL 32301

KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32301

AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

San Mateo, FL 32187

Cross Plaintiff

KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC

Cross Defendant

AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

San Mateo, FL 32187

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEIL P O'BRIEN

Attorney at FLORIN ROEBIG PA

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KATHERINE HECKERT

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS PA

Po Box 3239

Tampa, FL 33601-3239

ASHLEY M MATTINGLY

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP

400 N Ashley Dr, Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

ASHLEY M MATTINGLY

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP

400 N Ashley Dr, Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/09/2023 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

09/16/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/09/2023 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

06/27/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/09/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/20/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

07/15/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/10/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/09/2022 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: verified responses and objections to 1st set of interrogs by KB Home Jacksonville LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: (Crossclaim Pltf)KB Home Jacksonville LLC and objections to Notice of Service of Interrogs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: (Crossclaim Pltf)KB Home Jacksonville LLC and objections to request for admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: (Crossclaim Pltf)KB Home Jacksonville LLC and objections to request for production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (1st) to KB Home Jacksonville LLC by Sean Rooney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: (1st) to KB Home Jacksonville LLC by Sean Rooney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (1st) to KB Home Jacksonville LLC by Sean Rooney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of proposal for settlement by Sean Rooney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of proposal for settlement by Sean Rooney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of proposal for settlement by Sean Rooney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KB HOME Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 4; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 40.00; Credits: -40.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to American Lathing of North Florida Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to KB Home Jacksonville LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to KB Home Florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to KB Home

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less