This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/16/2022 at 21:45:14 (UTC).

SAS SPRING ARBOR MANAGERS LLC DBA HUNTERS CREEK APARTMENTS V. TARIQ MALIK

Case Summary

On 11/11/2021 SAS SPRING ARBOR MANAGERS LLC DBA HUNTERS CREEK APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TARIQ MALIK. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAS SPRING ARBOR MANAGERS LLC DBA HUNTERS CREEK APARTMENTS

HUNTERS CREEK APARTMENTS

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES I BARRON III P A

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant

TARIQ MALIK

Deland, FL 32720

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES I BARRON III

Attorney at JAMES I BARRON III PA

121 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/11/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

11/11/2021 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

11/11/2021 : DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/11/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

11/12/2021 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/19/2021 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/02/2021 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/14/2021 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/16/2021 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/16/2021 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

12/17/2021 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/28/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/28/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej by SAS Spring Aror Managers LLC.,etc Instrument: 2022047151 Book: 8210 Page: 4813

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: reviewed answer & no payment, no furhter hearing may be set by the court; rent must be deposited or all defenses are waived per F.S. 73.60(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: by Tariq Malik

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Tariq Malik

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Tariq Malik by posting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: summons and complaint to Tariq Malik

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To TARIQ MALIK fwd to pro serv(MAX)/Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by SAS Spring Arbor Managers LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; Description: from Angela

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less