This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/22/2022 at 14:17:01 (UTC).

SAS SPRING ARBOR MANAGERS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY V. VANESSA ITHIER

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 SAS SPRING ARBOR MANAGERS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VANESSA ITHIER. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAS SPRING ARBOR MANAGERS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MGFD LAW FIRM PA

Clearwater, FL 33761

Defendant

VANESSA ITHIER

Deland, FL 32720

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITNEY H DALY

Attorney at THE MGFD LAW FIRM PA

2753 Sr 580 Ste 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/20/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

04/20/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/20/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

04/20/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

04/20/2022 : DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

04/21/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

04/25/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/29/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

05/02/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/02/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

05/03/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

05/13/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

05/13/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

05/13/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

05/13/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT

05/19/2022 : DEFAULT

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

05/19/2022 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: agst Vanessa Ithier Instrument: 2022123322 Book: 8258 Page: 439

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: (judicial) as to Vanessa Ithier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: and default judgment as to Vanessa Ithier (cannot enter, answer filed 5/2/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Vanessa Ithier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (posted) Vanessa Ithier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: Crt has reviewed defs answer, no further action to be taken

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Vanessa Ithier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Vanessa Ithier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: summons and complaint to Vanessa Ithier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To VANESSA ITHIER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; Description: By Michael Geo F Davis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: By SAS Spring Arbor Managers LLC, etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Vanessa Ithier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAS SPRING ARBOR MANAGERS LLC DBA / HUNTERS CREEK APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where MGFD LAW FIRM PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DALY WHITNEY H