This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/28/2022 at 14:30:06 (UTC).

SAS SPRING ARBOR MANAGERS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY V. KIANA WEST, ETC.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 SAS SPRING ARBOR MANAGERS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KIANA WEST, ETC. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAS SPRING ARBOR MANAGERS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MGFD LAW FIRM PA

Clearwater, FL 33761

Defendants

KIANA WEST

Deland, FL 32720

KIANA V WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITNEY H DALY

Attorney at THE MGFD LAW FIRM PA

2753 Sr 580 Ste 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

09/07/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/07/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

09/07/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/13/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/20/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

09/26/2022 : NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Description: by SAS Spring Arbor Managers LLC etc Instrument: 2022228281 Book: 8320 Page: 25 View: 2022228281

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: summons and complaint to Kiana West etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Kiana West etc (posted)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KIANA WEST, AKA KIANA V WEST rtn to Pltf's Atty by mail for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Kiana West etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less