This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 08/22/2020 at 08:32:19 (UTC).

SARAH DAVIS V. ZUMRAD K ARIFKHANOVA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 SARAH DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZUMRAD K ARIFKHANOVA,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael S. Orfinger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael S. Orfinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SARAH DAVIS

RUE & ZIFFRA

Defendants

ZUMRAD K ARIFKHANOVA

ZAKHRO ARIFKHANOVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID L SWEAT

433 Silver Beach Avenue Suite 102

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM G HYLAND JR

Vernis & Bowling Of Central Florida P 1450 S Woodland Blvd 4Th Floor

Deland, FL 32720

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

01/17/2020 : ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

COMPLAINT

03/05/2019 : COMPLAINT

ORDER DENYING

06/05/2020 : ORDER DENYING

CERTIFICATE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

06/25/2020 : CERTIFICATE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

03/25/2020 : STIPULATION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

09/05/2019 : OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/18/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/10/2020 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/15/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Jury Trial; Court Officer: Michael S. Orfinger; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Michael S. Orfinger; Location: CI304, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Jury Trial; Court Officer: Michael S. Orfinger; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Michael S. Orfinger; Location: City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Sarah Davis Instrument: 2020156198 Book: 7898 Page: 1612

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Docket Type: ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: trial to 2/15/2021 and docket sounding to 2/11/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of proposed Order granting Dfnt's Motion to Continue Trial to David Sweat Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Zumrad K Arifkhanova and Zakhro Arifkhanova of non-objection

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Jury Trial; Court Officer: Michael S. Orfinger; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ZAKHRO ARIFKHANOVA ret to atty via e service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ZUMRAD K ARIFKHANOVA ret to atty via e service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Zunrad K Arifkhanova and Zakhro Arifkhanova

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Zakhro Arifkhanova by Sarah Davis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Zakhro Arifkhanova by Sarah Davis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Zumrad K Arifkhanova by Sarah Davis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Zumrad K Arifkhanova by Sarah Davis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by David L Sweat

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RUE & ZIFFRA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM G HYLAND JR