This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/07/2021 at 18:35:20 (UTC).

SANDRA NIZOLEK V. MANUEL VASQUEZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 SANDRA NIZOLEK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MANUEL VASQUEZ. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANDRA NIZOLEK

DAN NEWLIN INJURY ATTORNEYS

Defendants

TWIN MED LLC A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MANUEL VASQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGE H ANDERSON III

Dan Newlin Injury Attorneys 7335 W Sand Lake Rd Ste 300

Orlando, FL 32819

 

Court Documents

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

01/20/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

01/20/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/13/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/08/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/08/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/08/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/08/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/08/2021 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/08/2021 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT

01/08/2021 : COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To TWIN MED, LLC, A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY fwd to pltf atty by e-service for sop cc pltf atty by e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To MANUEL VASQUEZ fwd to pltf atty by e-service for sop cc pltf atty by e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Twin Med LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Manuel Vasquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Manuel Vasquez by Sandra Nixolek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Twin Med LLC by Sandra Nixolek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Twin Med LLC by Sandra Nixolek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Manuel Vazquez by Sandra Nixolek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWIN MED LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON GEORGE H III