This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 08/07/2022 at 03:04:29 (UTC).

SAMUEL W GROOME, ET AL V. HOLIDAY KAMPER COMPANY OF COLUMBIA LLC DBA CAMPING WORLD RV SALES A MINNESOTA LIMITED, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 SAMUEL W GROOME filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOLIDAY KAMPER COMPANY OF COLUMBIA LLC DBA CAMPING WORLD RV SALES A MINNESOTA LIMITED. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAMUEL W GROOME

MARATHON ALPACAS AND FIBER MILL CORP A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

BOGIN MUNNS & MUNNS P A

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

HOLIDAY KAMPER COMPANY OF COLUMBIA LLC DBA CAMPING WORLD RV SALES A MINNESOTA LIMITED

St Paul, MN 55117

CAMPING WORLD RV SALES A MINNESOTA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CAMPING WORLD INC FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TATIANA E CRUZ

Attorney at BOGIN MUNNS & MUNNS P A

P O Box 2807

Orlando, FL 32802-2807

Defendant Attorney

ERIC S ADAMS

Attorney at SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/19/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/19/2021 : COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/19/2021 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/19/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/19/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

10/22/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

10/22/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

10/26/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

10/26/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/04/2021 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/15/2021 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

02/04/2022 : AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/07/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/21/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION TO TRANSFER / TRANSFERRING

04/29/2022 : MOTION TO TRANSFER / TRANSFERRING

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

05/04/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: D-413, DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: Dfnt's Verified Mtn to Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: MOTION TO TRANSFER / TRANSFERRING; Description: by Holiday Kamper Company of Columbia LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: (as to Amd Complaint)Holiday Kamper Company of Columbia LLC.,etc w/affirm defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Eric S Adams obo Holiday Kamper Co of Columbia LLC etc et al w/designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT; Description: no change in case style

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: on Holiday Kamper Co of Columbia LLC by Samuel W Groome

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: on Camping World Inc by Samuel W Groome

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To CAMPING WORLD, INC. Foreign Profit Corporation forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To HOLIDAY KAMPER COMPANY OF COLUMBIA, LLC DBA CAMPING WORLD RV SALES, A Minnesota Limited Liability Company forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Holiday Kamper Co of Columbia LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Camping World Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Holiday Kamper Company of Columbia LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bogin, Munns & Munns, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Camping World RV Sales, LLC doing business as Camping World RV Sales - Jackson is a litigant

Latest cases where CAMPING WORLD INC is a litigant