This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/25/2022 at 06:21:42 (UTC).

RYAN DANIEL STANFORD V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 RYAN DANIEL STANFORD filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RYAN DANIEL STANFORD

KROHN & MOSS LTD

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NATALIA SINGH

Krohn & Moss Ltd, 10 N Dearborn Street 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM L BROMAGEN

Attorney at BROMAGEN & RATHET P A

135 2Nd Ave N Ste 1

Jacksonville, FL 32250

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

07/14/2022 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

WITNESS LIST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

03/08/2022 : WITNESS LIST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/01/2022 : REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/01/2022 : REQUEST FOR COPIES

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/15/2021 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/14/2021 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/14/2021 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/13/2021 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/13/2021 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/13/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/13/2021 : MOTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/13/2021 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/06/2021 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

12/02/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

INTERROGATORIES

11/30/2021 : INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/30/2021 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/30/2021 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/30/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Ryan Daniel Stanford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: WITNESS LIST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: (expert) Ryan Daniel Stanford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR COPIES; Description: of docs per subp directed to Gary Yeomans Ford Daytona by Ford Motor Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR COPIES; Description: of docs per subp directed to Florida Trucks by Ford Motor Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Description: by Ryan Daniel Stanford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Ryan Daniel Stanford to Dfnt's request for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Ryan Daniel Stanford to Dfnt's mtn to preserve evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Ryan Daniel Stanford by Ford Motor Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Ryan Daniel Stanford by Ford Motor Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Ryan Daniel Stanford by Ford Motor Co

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To FORD MOTOR COMPANY forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: INTERROGATORIES; Description: To Ford Motor Company By Ryan Daniel Stanford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: To Ford Motor Company By Ryan Daniel Stanford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: To Ford Motor Company By Ryan Daniel Stanford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: To Ford Motor Company By Ryan Daniel Stanford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Ford Motor Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KROHN & MOSS, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bromagen, William L