This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/24/2022 at 02:25:52 (UTC).

RONNIE WILLIAMS V. GLEN SALZMAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 RONNIE WILLIAMS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GLEN SALZMAN,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dennis Craig. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dennis Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RONNIE WILLIAMS

Defendants

GLEN SALZMAN

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

VEANITA SALZMAN

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

ANY UNKNOWN TENANT

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGE BURDEN

1119 Jacaranda Avenue

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Defendant Attorney

MONICA HIRSCH WILSON

112 Orange Ave Ste 100

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/07/2021 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/15/2021 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/01/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

09/20/2021 : REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

11/15/2021 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

09/22/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

10/04/2021 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/07/2021 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

09/01/2021 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej Instrument: 2022078982 Book: 8231 Page: 4584

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING; Description: lis pendens by Ronnie Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Ronnie Willaims to Glen Salzman and Veanita Salzman's request to produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Description: by Ronnie Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (1st) to Ronnie Williams by Glen and Veanita Salzman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Glen and Veanita Salzman w/affirmative defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: Glen Salzman et al to respond to complaint w/i 15 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to complaint by Glen and Veanita Salzman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Monica Hirsch Wilson obo Glen and Veanita Salzman and email designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (alias) Any Unknown Tenant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 3; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 30.00; Credits: -30.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ANY UNKNOWN TENANT fwd to pltf's atty for SOP via eserve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To VEANITA SALZMAN fwd to pltf's atty for SOP via eserve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To GLEN SALZMAN fwd to pltf's atty for SOP via eserve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Glen Salzman et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2021212851 Book: 8114 Page: 228

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILSON , MONICA HIRSCH