Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/23/2020 at 17:12:39 (UTC).

RIGHTLINE LLC, ETC. V. NICK AGNEW, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 RIGHTLINE LLC, ETC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against NICK AGNEW. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BYRD CAMPBELL P A

RIGHTLINE LLC

Defendant

METRIX LLC

1St Party Defendant

NICK AGNEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TUCKER H BYRD

180 Park Ave North Ste 2A

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant and 1St Party Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL E LONG

620 N Wymore Rd Ste 270

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/11/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ORDER GRANTING

11/06/2018 : ORDER GRANTING

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

09/26/2018 : STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

05/07/2018 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

RECEIPT

03/08/2018 : RECEIPT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/18/2018 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

08/15/2017 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/03/2017 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/03/2017 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET

05/20/2019 : NOTICE OF ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET

ORDER FOR SANCTIONS

11/07/2018 : ORDER FOR SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE

09/10/2018 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/10/2018 : AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

ORDER

08/30/2018 : ORDER

MOTION TO COMPEL

07/18/2018 : MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/15/2018 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE

12/01/2017 : MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/04/2017 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2019
  • HearingSession Type: Jury Trial; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: 4A, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • HearingSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: D-413, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Docket Type: ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Docket Type: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: trial by Rightline LLC etc et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Rightime LLC.,etc to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Docket Type: MOTION IN LIMINE; Description: to strike witnesses or alt mtn to cont trial by Nick Agnew et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: response to 1st set of interrogs by Rightline LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Rightline LLC etc by Nick Agnew & Metrix LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Rightline LLC etc by Nick Agnew & Metrix LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION; Description: w/Rick Joyce

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: (Amd)by Rightline LLC,etc w/no prop Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Rightline LLC w/out prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To METRIX LLC Fwd pltf atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To NICK AGNEW Fwd pltf atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Metrix LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Nick Agnew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUCKER BYRD