This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 08/12/2022 at 02:48:54 (UTC).

RICHARD S ROGERS D C CHARTERED DBA AURORA CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC PATIENT HEATHER LICARDO SOUTH V. UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/11/2022 RICHARD S ROGERS D C CHARTERED DBA AURORA CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC PATIENT HEATHER LICARDO SOUTH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICHARD S ROGERS D C CHARTERED DBA AURORA CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC PATIENT HEATHER LICARDO SOUTH

AURORA CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC

HEATHER LICARDO SOUTH

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD CHRISTENSEN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

BLAKE A LEVINE

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/11/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/11/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/14/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

06/24/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

07/14/2022 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

ORDER TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

08/05/2022 : ORDER TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI305, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: ORDER TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Description: Waiving SC Pretrial and Setting CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to complaint by United Financial Casualty Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: Chief Financial Officer obo United Financial Casualty Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY Fwd to pltf's atty by mail w/CMO attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To United Financial Casualty Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where AURORA CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Financial Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant