This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 01/27/2021 at 13:07:23 (UTC).

REGENCY APARTMENTS LLC V. YSABELLA HOLLOWAY

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 REGENCY APARTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YSABELLA HOLLOWAY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGENCY APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

YSABELLA HOLLOWAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/28/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

INFORMATION SHEET

12/28/2020 : INFORMATION SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

12/28/2020 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/28/2020 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/28/2020 : CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/28/2020 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

12/28/2020 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/28/2020 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/30/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/06/2021 : VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/13/2021 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej by Regency Apartments LLC Instrument: 2021008372 Book: 7972 Page: 699

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Ysabella Holloway, 5 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 3.50; Final Amount: 3.50; Credits: -3.50; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to YSABELLA HOLLOWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To YSABELLA HOLLOWAY fwd to VCSO w/$40ck for sop, cc Ptf by e service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Ysabella Holloway

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Laura Smith to case closure after 90 days of inactivity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Laura SMith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession - Failure to COmply w/lease

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGENCY APTS INC is a litigant