This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 12/28/2022 at 13:46:37 (UTC).

REGAL PINEWOOD LLC V. CASSANDRA DAILY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 REGAL PINEWOOD LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CASSANDRA DAILY,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A. Sanders, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGAL PINEWOOD LLC

Monsey, NY 10952

Defendants

CASSANDRA DAILY

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

ANDREW MUMBRAUER

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

Not Classified By Court

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

12/15/2022 : NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/13/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

12/08/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

12/08/2022 : NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

12/08/2022 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

12/08/2022 : NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/06/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/06/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

12/06/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

12/06/2022 : NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/06/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/06/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/29/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

11/29/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/29/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

11/29/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/29/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

11/29/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 20.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.60; Final Amount: 0.60; Credits: -0.60; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT; Description: of $20.60 ($20.00 rent + $0.60 court registry deposit fee) by Andrew Mumbrauer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Andrew Mumbrauer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 89.32; Final Amount: 89.32; Credits: -89.32; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.68; Final Amount: 2.68; Credits: -2.68; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.15; Final Amount: 0.15; Credits: -0.15; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 170.00; Final Amount: 170.00; Credits: -170.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.10; Final Amount: 5.10; Credits: -5.10; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: Court has reviewed Dfnts Req for Addtl Time to Deposit Rent; No action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 3; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 15.00; Credits: -15.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS fwd to VSO w/mo #19-442852399 $120.00 for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to ANDREW MUMBRAUER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ANDREW MUMBRAUER fwd to VSO w/mo #19-442852399 $120.00 for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to CASSANDRA DAILY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To CASSANDRA DAILY fwd to VSO w/mo #19-442852399 $120.00 for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Greg Simpson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: poss/MH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less