This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 01/09/2023 at 21:45:04 (UTC).

RAKHI PATEL, ETC. V. ROSE MARY MULERO

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 RAKHI PATEL, ETC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROSE MARY MULERO. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAKHI PATEL

Orange City, FL 32763

1876 HERITAGE INN

Orange City, FL 32763

Defendant

ROSE MARY MULERO

Orange City, FL 32763

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION SHEET

12/01/2022 : INFORMATION SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

12/01/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

12/01/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/01/2022 : CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/01/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

12/01/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/01/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/06/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/06/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

12/08/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

12/08/2022 : ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/09/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

HEARING SHEET

12/14/2022 : HEARING SHEET

ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

12/21/2022 : ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

HEARING SHEET

01/03/2023 : HEARING SHEET

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

01/03/2023 : ORDER OF DISMISSAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: ADZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled; Comments: dfnt's mtn/determine rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: ADZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled; Comments: Dfnts M/Determine Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (posted) Rose Mary Mulero

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: Court has reviewed Dfnts Answer; Matter will be scheduled for Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Rosemary Mulero

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 3.50; Final Amount: 3.50; Credits: -3.50; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to ROSE MARY MULERO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ROSE MARY MULERO fwd to VSO w/mo #2228844876 $40.00 for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Jane Bromwich

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Rakhi Patel etc to close case after 90 days inactivity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Rose Mary Mulero

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: poss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less