This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/22/2022 at 14:17:48 (UTC).

RAJAN WADHAWAN, ETC., ET AL V. ASHLEE WEBER

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 RAJAN WADHAWAN, ETC , filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ASHLEE WEBER. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A. Sanders, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAJAN WADHAWAN

PAWINI KHANNA

Defendant

ASHLEE WEBER

Deland, FL 32724

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM J MCCABE

1250 S Highway 17-92 Ste 210

Longwood, FL 32750

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/20/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

04/20/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/20/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

04/20/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/20/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

04/29/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

04/29/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

05/06/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

05/09/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

05/09/2022 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT

05/12/2022 : DEFAULT

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

05/12/2022 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/16/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

05/16/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: fj by Rajan Wadhawan et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: agst Ashlee Weber Instrument: 2022117110 Book: 8254 Page: 3219

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Ashlee Weber by Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Rajan Wadhawan,et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: reviewed deft's answer,no further action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Ashlee Weber

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Ashlee Weber

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Ashlee Weber/5 day/posted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to ASHLEE WEBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ASHLEE WEBER rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Ashlee Weber

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCABE WILLIAM J