This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 01/28/2023 at 07:36:12 (UTC).

RADIOLOGY REGIONAL CENTER PA(PATIENT:JESSICA COFFEY) V. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 RADIOLOGY REGIONAL CENTER PA PATIENT JESSICA COFFEY filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RADIOLOGY REGIONAL CENTER PA(PATIENT:JESSICA COFFEY)

JESSICA COFFEY

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W MICHAEL SKIRVIN

7171 North Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

AUTUMN LESTER

Andrews Biernacki Davis, 390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/10/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/10/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

12/07/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

12/13/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

01/05/2023 : NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/05/2023 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

01/12/2023 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to file responses to complaint by Progressive Select Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Autumn Lester Esq obo Progressive Select Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by Radiology Regional Center PA.,etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: CFO obo Progressive Select Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Progressive Select Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less