This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 13:03:11 (UTC).

RADIOLOGY REGIONAL CENTER P A PATIENT DONALD R TURNER V. PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 RADIOLOGY REGIONAL CENTER P A PATIENT DONALD R TURNER filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RADIOLOGY REGIONAL CENTER P A PATIENT DONALD R TURNER

DONALD R TURNER

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Glendale, CA 91203-2336

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W MICHAEL SKIRVIN

7171 North Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

01/06/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/06/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

01/07/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURNED SUMMONS UNUSED

01/17/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNUSED

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/17/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

01/20/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: AMENDED To PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf's atty for SOP via eserve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: (amd) to Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNUSED; Description: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 80.00; Final Amount: 80.00; Credits: -80.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Radiology Regional Center (PA) is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant