This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/03/2022 at 15:42:18 (UTC).

RADIOLOGY REGIONAL CENTER P A PATIENT DENICE LOTZ V. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 RADIOLOGY REGIONAL CENTER P A PATIENT DENICE LOTZ filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RADIOLOGY REGIONAL CENTER P A PATIENT DENICE LOTZ

DENICE LOTZ

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W MICHAEL SKIRVIN

7171 North Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

05/12/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

05/12/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

05/16/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/30/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

06/07/2022 : NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/17/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/17/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prejudice, by Radiology Regional Center PA Instrument: 2022145962 Book: 8271 Page: 4938 View: 2022145962

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by Radiology Regional Center PA.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: CFO obo Progressive American Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY Fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Progressive American Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Radiology Regional Center (PA) is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant