This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/26/2022 at 13:16:30 (UTC).

PRESGAR IMAGING OF ROCKLEDGE L L C A A O LEON DENSON V. NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 PRESGAR IMAGING OF ROCKLEDGE L L C A A O LEON DENSON filed an Other lawsuit against NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRESGAR IMAGING OF ROCKLEDGE L L C A A O LEON DENSON

LEON DENSON

JONATHAN DE ARMAS P A

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

Defendant

NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JONATHAN R DE ARMAS

222 South Westmonte Drive Suite 227

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

ALICIA JESKEY

Attorney at JONATHAN DEARMAS PA

222 South Westmonte Dr Ste 227

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

Defendant Attorney

MELANIE Y PATRICH

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER PA

501 360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/13/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/13/2022 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

05/17/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/20/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

05/25/2022 : NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/26/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT

05/26/2022 : DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

05/26/2022 : MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

06/01/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company w/affirmative defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Description: by Nationwide Mutual Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Nationwide Mutual Ins Co for jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Melanie Y Patrich obo Nationwide Mutual Ins Co and email designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Description: of Alicia Jeskey Esq obo Presgar Imiaging of Rockledge LLC etc w/designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: Chief Financial Officer obo Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN CORPORATION Fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESGAR IMAGING ROCKLEDGE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrich, Melanie Yael