This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/03/2023 at 13:31:04 (UTC).

PRESGAR IMAGING OF ROCKLEDGE L L C A A O CHRISTOPHER GREENE V. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 PRESGAR IMAGING OF ROCKLEDGE L L C A A O CHRISTOPHER GREENE filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRESGAR IMAGING OF ROCKLEDGE L L C A A O CHRISTOPHER GREENE

CHRISTOPHER GREENE

DE ARMAS LAW

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

PROGRESSIVE A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENNIFER PEATTIE

Attorney at DE ARMAS LAW

237 S Westmonte Dr Ste 110

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

Defendant Attorney

AUTUMN LESTER

Andrews Biernacki Davis, 390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/23/2022 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/23/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

12/06/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

12/08/2022 : AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/19/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

12/21/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/04/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/12/2023 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/17/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/17/2023 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/17/2023 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Progressive Select Ins Co by Presgar Imaging of Rockledge LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Progressive Select Ins Co by Presgar Imaging of Rockledge LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Progressive Select Ins Co by Presgar Imaging of Rockledge LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Autumn Lester Esq obo Progressive Select Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: CFO obo Progressive Select Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: as to AMENDED complaint To PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION fwd to pltfs atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Progressive Select etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT; Description: correcting dfnt to Progressive Select Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To PROGRESSIVE, A FOREIGN CORPORATION Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Of Jennifer Peattie Esq obo Presgar Imaging of Rockledge LLC etc - w/ designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less