This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/03/2020 at 11:03:03 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC V. CRAIG L GOODMAN JR

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CRAIG L GOODMAN JR. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David A. Cromartie and Christopher Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David A. Cromartie

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HAYT HAYT & LANDAU P L

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

CRAIG L GOODMAN JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON S DRAGUTSKY

Attorney at HAYT HAYT & LANDAU P L

7765 Sw 87 Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/26/2019 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

11/21/2019 : MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

11/07/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

10/22/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

10/21/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

10/21/2019 : REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

06/27/2019 : PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/25/2019 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

06/24/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

06/18/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

06/03/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

05/31/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

05/31/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

05/31/2019 : COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: P/T by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Craig L Goodman Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: ALIAS To CRAIG L GOODMAN JR fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Description: to Craig L Goodman Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL; Description: Return summons,unexec as to Craig L Goodman,Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: David A. Cromartie; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Craig L Goodman Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To CRAIG L GOODMAN JR ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Craig L Goodman Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Portfolio etc w/o Or

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less