This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/30/2022 at 22:24:00 (UTC).

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION V. DANIELLE L POLLOCK, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DANIELLE L POLLOCK,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

Delray Beach, FL 33484

Defendants

DANIELLE L POLLOCK

Deland, FL 32720

LARRY THOMAS BLAIR JR

Deland, FL 32720

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Deland, FL 32720

UNKN0WN TENANT #2

Deland, FL 32720

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JULIA Y POLETTI

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/12/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/12/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

06/13/2022 : NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

04/07/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

03/29/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

03/29/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

03/29/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

03/29/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/23/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/23/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/23/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/23/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

03/23/2022 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

03/23/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

03/23/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

03/23/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

03/23/2022 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

03/23/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/out prej by PNC Bank National Association Instrument: 2022167383 Book: 8284 Page: 3820 View: 2022167383

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME; Description: of law firm address by Aldridge Pite LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 905.00; Final Amount: 905.00; Credits: -905.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 4; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 40.00; Credits: -40.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKN0WN TENANT #2 fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN TENANT #1 fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To LARRY THOMAS BLAIR JR fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Tenant #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Larry Thomas Blair Jr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Danielle L Pollock

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by PNC Bank,N.A. w/no prop Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Julia Poletti,Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022072545 Book: 8227 Page: 3281 View: 2022072545

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aldridge Pite, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLETTI, JULIA