This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/20/2022 at 23:16:46 (UTC).

PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION V. CONNIE BEATY, ETC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CONNIE BEATY, ETC . This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

TIFFANY & BOSCO P A

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendants

CONNIE BEATY

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

ROBIN LYNN YAZELL

Deland, FL 32724

UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 1 OF THE ESTATE OF PAMELA JACKSON A K A PAMELA MARY JACKSON

Deland, FL 32724

UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 2 OF THE ESTATE OF PAMELA JACKSON A K A PAMELA MARY JACKSON

Deland, FL 32724

UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 3 OF THE ESTATE OF PAMELA JACKSON A K A PAMELA MARY JACKSON

Deland, FL 32724

UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 4 OF THE ESTATE OF PAMELA JACKSON A K A PAMELA MARY JACKSON

Deland, FL 32724

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Tampa, FL 33602

PAMELA MARY JACKSON

Not Classified By Court

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

Deland, FL 32724

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

Deland, FL 32724

Guardian Ad Litem

JULIA B KITEPOWELL

Tampa, FL 33679-8645

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHRYN I KASPER

Attorney at TIFFANY & BOSCO P A

1201 S Orlando Ave Suite 430

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant Attorney

JOHN F RUDY III

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

JULIA B KITE-POWELL

Po Box 18645

Tampa, FL 33679-8645

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE

04/25/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

ORDER GRANTING

04/14/2022 : ORDER GRANTING

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

04/13/2022 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

DEFAULT

04/07/2022 : DEFAULT

PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT

04/05/2022 : PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

04/05/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

03/09/2022 : PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

03/07/2022 : PROOF OF PUBLICATION

MAIL RETURNED FROM

03/04/2022 : MAIL RETURNED FROM

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/17/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/17/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/17/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/17/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

08/17/2021 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/17/2021 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

08/17/2021 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

08/17/2021 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/17/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of copy of Order Granting Pltf's Mtn to Dispense w/Mediation by PHH Mortgage Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Docket Type: ORDER GRANTING; Description: pltfs mtn to dispense w/mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: PHH Mtg Corp to dispense with mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Connie Beaty etc, Robin Lynn Yazell, Unkn Heir etc Devisee 1-4 of Pamela Jackson etc, Unkn Party in Possession 1 nka Christopher Ferry and Unkn Party in Possession 2 nka Lisette Ferry (can not enter last 2, answer filed 10/22/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Docket(#57) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Anthony R Smith Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Docket Type: PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Connie Beaty etc, Robin Lynn Yazell, Unkn Heir etc Devisee 1-4 of Pamela Jackson etc, Unkn Party in Possession 1 nka Christopher Ferry and Unknown Party in Possession 2 nka Lisette Ferry (can not enter last 2, answer filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Docket Type: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Docket Type: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: Robin Lynn Yazell

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unk. Heir 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unk. Heir 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unk. Heir 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Robin Lynn Yazell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Connie Beaty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2021198027 Book: 8104 Page: 1407

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: real property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIFFANY & BOSCO P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where PHH Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JULIA B KITE-POWELL