This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 01/07/2021 at 18:43:16 (UTC).

PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY V. MARIA I BERRIOS TORRES

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MARIA I BERRIOS TORRES. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

MARIA I BERRIOS TORRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN M SABGHIR

18 People'S Trust Way Ste 100

Deerfield Beach, FL 33441

 

Court Documents

RETURNED WITNESS SUBPOENA SERVED

01/05/2021 : RETURNED WITNESS SUBPOENA SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/30/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/29/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

12/29/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/18/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/07/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/07/2020 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/07/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/07/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/07/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/07/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/07/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/07/2020 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

12/07/2020 : COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: RETURNED WITNESS SUBPOENA SERVED; Description: Corp Rep designee for 911 Claims Corp or Gian Carlo Debernardini

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: Maria I Berrios Torres rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Maria I Berrios Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Peoples First Ins Co for Entry Upon Land Served w/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Maria I Berrios Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of C/R Gian Carlo DeBernardi of 911 Claims Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: Initial to Maria I Berrios Torres by Peoples Trust Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: Initial to Maria I Berrios Torres by Peoples Trust Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: Initial to Maria I Berrios Torres by Peoples Trust Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Jonathan M Sabghir Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peoples Trust Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan M Sabghir