This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/28/2022 at 23:11:45 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC V. TONYA MICHELLE HARRIS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TONYA MICHELLE HARRIS,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

TIFFANY & BOSCO P A

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendants

TONYA MICHELLE HARRIS

Deltona, FL 32725

ANDRE NOEL JAMES

Sanford, FL 32773-4347

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TONYA MICHELLE HARRIS

Deltona, FL 32725

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANDRE NOEL JAMES

Deltona, FL 32725

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

Deltona, FL 32725

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

Deltona, FL 32725

LAKE BATON ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHRYN I KASPER

Attorney at TIFFANY & BOSCO P A

1201 S Orlando Ave Suite 430

Winter Park, FL 32789

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/25/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/22/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

07/11/2022 : ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

06/17/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

06/17/2022 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

DEFAULT

06/10/2022 : DEFAULT

PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT

06/07/2022 : PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

06/07/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

06/07/2022 : NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/22/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/22/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/22/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/22/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

03/22/2022 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

03/22/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

03/22/2022 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

03/22/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/22/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej by PennyMac Loan Services LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40); Docket Type: ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: Dfnt has 20 days to respond to Pltf's complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Tonya Fisher fka Tonya Michelle Harris

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to answer complaint by Tonya Michelle Fisher fka Tonya Michelle Harris

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Unkn Spouse of Tonya Michelle Harris & Lake Barton Estates Homeowners Association Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36); Docket Type: PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Unkn Spouse of Tonya Michelle Harris & Lake Baton Estates Homeowners Association Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34); Docket Type: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Description: Unkn Spouse of Andre Noel James, Unkn Party in Possession 1 & Unkn Party in Possession 2 Instrument: 2022138561 Book: 8267 Page: 2233 View: 2022138561

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: Agreed Order granting dfts mtn for enlargement of time by Pennymac Loan Services LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Party in Possession 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Spouse of Andre Noel James

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Andre Noel James

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Spouse of Tonya Michelle Harris

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Tonya Michelle Harris

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022071572 Book: 8226 Page: 4831 View: 2022071572

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKE BATON ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TIFFANY & BOSCO P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where PennyMac Loan Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kasper, Kathryn I