This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/08/2021 at 18:33:36 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC V. TAMMY MAULDIN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TAMMY MAULDIN. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

TIFFANY & BOSCO P A

Defendants

BRYANT B SKINNER JR

TRAILS WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMY MAULDIN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PAUL R JENKINS JR

TAMMY MAULDIN

Not Classified By Court

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHRYN I KASPER

Attorney at TIFFANY & BOSCO P A

1201 S Orlando Ave Suite 430

Winter Park, FL 32789

 

Court Documents

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

04/20/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

04/20/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

04/20/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

04/20/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

04/20/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

04/20/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

04/20/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

04/19/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/08/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/08/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/08/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/08/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/08/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/08/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/08/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

04/08/2021 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

04/08/2021 : WORKSHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PAUL R. JENKINS, JR. fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To BRYANT B. SKINNER, JR. fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To TRAILS WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMY MAULDIN fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2 fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To TAMMY MAULDIN fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12.5) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by PennyMac Loan Services LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 905.00; Final Amount: 905.00; Credits: -905.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 2.50; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Bryant B Skinner Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Trails Wesst Homeowners Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Spouse of Tammy Mauldin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Party 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Party 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Tammy Mauldin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2021085354 Book: 8028 Page: 1648

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: for real property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIFFANY & BOSCO P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where PennyMac Loan Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kasper, Kathryn I