This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 11/07/2022 at 22:02:43 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC V. NAAMON LEWIS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NAAMON LEWIS,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dennis Craig. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dennis Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

TIFFANY & BOSCO P A

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendants

NAAMON LEWIS

Holly Hill, FL 32117

MARY L LEWIS

Holly Hill, FL 32117-3127

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

Holly Hill, FL 32117

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

Holly Hill, FL 32117

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A

Glen Allen, VA 23060

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHRYN I KASPER

Attorney at TIFFANY & BOSCO P A

1201 S Orlando Ave Suite 430

Winter Park, FL 32789

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/20/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/20/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/19/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/30/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/30/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/30/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/30/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/30/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/24/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/24/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/24/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/24/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/24/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

08/24/2022 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/24/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

08/24/2022 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

08/24/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/24/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/out prej by Pennymac Loan Services LLC Instrument: 2022244523 Book: 8329 Page: 919 View: 2022244523

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by PennyMac Loan Services LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 5; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: -50.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2 Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To MARY L. LEWIS Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Capital One Bank USA NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Party in Possession 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Party in Possession 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Mary L Lewis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Naamon Lewis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022203076 Book: 8305 Page: 820 View: 2022203076

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less