This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 00:27:25 (UTC).

PC COUNTRYSIDE LLC V. RUSSELL BRYANT

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 PC COUNTRYSIDE LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUSSELL BRYANT. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

PC COUNTRYSIDE LLC

Defendant

RUSSELL BRYANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGE L PALMA

Andreu Palma Lavin & Solis 815 Nw 57Th Avenue Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126-2363

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

02/18/2020 : ORDER OF DISMISSAL

COURT NOTES

02/18/2020 : COURT NOTES

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

02/11/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/09/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

12/31/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/27/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/27/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/27/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej Instrument: 2020039066 Book: 7819 Page: 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Russell Bryant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To RUSSELL BRYANT fwd to pltfs atty & proc serv(Max) via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Russell Bryant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by PC Countryside LLC w/no prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by PC Countryside LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less