This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 01/06/2023 at 15:57:13 (UTC).

PARC HILL APARTMENT PARTNERS LTD V. TAMARA S JOHNSON, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 PARC HILL APARTMENT PARTNERS LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TAMARA S JOHNSON,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PARC HILL APARTMENT PARTNERS LTD

MILLER JOHNSON LAW P L

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

Defendants

TAMARA S JOHNSON

Orange City, FL 32763

TERRANCE SMITH

Orange City, FL 32763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY B JOHNSON

Attorney at MILLER JOHNSON LAW PL

247 Maitland Ave Ste 1000

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

12/30/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/30/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

12/21/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

12/19/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/19/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/19/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/15/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/12/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/12/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/07/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

12/07/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/07/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

12/07/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/01/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/01/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

12/01/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

12/01/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej by Pac Hill Apartment Partners LTD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Tamara S Johnson et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: Court has reviewed Dfnts Answer; No further action taken at this time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Terrance Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Tamara S Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Terrance Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Tamara S Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Tamara S Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to TERRANCE SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To TERRANCE SMITH rtn to Pltf's Atty via e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to TAMARA S JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To TAMARA S JOHNSON rtn to Pltf's Atty via e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Terrance Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Tamara S Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Tamara S Johnson and Terrance Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less