This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/15/2020 at 04:45:30 (UTC).

PAGANO CHIROPRACTIC P A PATIENT WILLY VALDEZ V. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 PAGANO CHIROPRACTIC P A PATIENT WILLY VALDEZ filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLY VALDEZ

PAGANO CHIROPRACTIC P A PATIENT WILLY VALDEZ

GED LAWYERS LLP

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL R PRINCE

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

DAVID M GAGNON

Taylor, Day, Grimm & Boyd 50 N Laura St Ste 3500

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/11/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/11/2019 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/11/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

12/12/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

12/20/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/20/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/27/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/28/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO STRIKE

01/28/2020 : MOTION TO STRIKE

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/28/2020 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

HEARING SHEET

01/28/2020 : HEARING SHEET

STIPULATION AND ORDER

01/28/2020 : STIPULATION AND ORDER

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/14/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/14/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/14/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/06/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/09/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/out prejudice by Pagano Chiropractic PA Instrument: 2020051901 Book: 7827 Page: 3407

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: State Farm Fire and Casualty Co to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company by Pagano Chiropractic PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company by Pagano Chiropractic PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company by Pagano Chiropractic PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI305, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: STIPULATION AND ORDER; Description: small claims p/t worksheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Description: by Pagano Chiropractic PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: MOTION TO STRIKE; Description: affirm defenses by Pagano Chiropractic PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of David M Gagnon Esq obo State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company & AFFIRM defenses & DEMAND for jury trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: David M Gagnon and Victoria E Armstrong obo State Farm and email designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: CFO State of Florida obo State Farm Fire & Casualty Company emailed 12-20-2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ret to atty via e service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to State Farm etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE , MICHAEL RYAN