This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 11/06/2021 at 13:05:50 (UTC).

PAC INVESTORS LLC DBA PARK AT COUNTRYSIDE APARTMENTS V. BRANDON C ADAIR

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 PAC INVESTORS LLC DBA PARK AT COUNTRYSIDE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRANDON C ADAIR. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Belle B. Schumann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Belle B. Schumann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAC INVESTORS LLC DBA PARK AT COUNTRYSIDE APARTMENTS

PARK AT COUNTRYSIDE APARTMENTS

BARFIELD MCCAIN P A

Defendant

BRANDON C ADAIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN R MCCAIN

Attorney at BARFIELD MCCAIN P A

4241 Northlake Blvd Suite B

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT

11/01/2021 : DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

10/29/2021 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

10/29/2021 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT

10/29/2021 : PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

10/29/2021 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

10/15/2021 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/12/2021 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

10/08/2021 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/07/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

10/07/2021 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/07/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Brandon C Adair

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Brandon C Adair

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by PAC Investors LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Brandon C Adair

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (5day) Brandon C Adair

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: summons and complaint to Brandon C Adair

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To BRANDON C ADAIR rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Brandon Adair

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN