This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 08/09/2022 at 19:08:52 (UTC).

ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTIES OF TAMPA BAY P A A A O WILLIAM CORDER V. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTIES OF TAMPA BAY P A A A O WILLIAM CORDER filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTIES OF TAMPA BAY P A A A O WILLIAM CORDER

WILLIAM CORDER

JONATHAN DE ARMAS P A

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALICIA JESKEY

Attorney at JONATHAN DEARMAS PA

222 South Westmonte Dr Ste 227

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

JONATHAN R DE ARMAS

222 South Westmonte Drive Suite 227

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

Defendant Attorney

TIFFANY V COLBERT

Andrews Biernacki Davis, 390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/16/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/16/2022 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

05/18/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/20/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/25/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

05/25/2022 : NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

06/09/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/22/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Orthopaedic Specialties of Tampa Bay PA.,etc by Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Progressive American Insurance Co w/affirm defenses and Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Description: of Alicia Jeskey Esq obo Orthopaedic Specialties of Tampa Bay PA etc w/designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Tiffany V Colbert obo Progressive American Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: Chief Financial Officer obo Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN CORPORATION w/ CMO att'd fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTIES OF TAMPA BAY PA is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLBERT TIFFANY V