Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/06/2020 at 04:00:14 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC AS SERVICER FOR WELLS FARGO BANK N A AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN, V. KEVIN S HARPER

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC AS SERVICER FOR WELLS FARGO BANK N A AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEVIN S HARPER. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2015 3

WELLS FARGO BANK N A

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC AS SERVICER FOR WELLS FARGO BANK N A AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN

Defendant

KEVIN S HARPER

Deland, FL 32720

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHARON J WALKER

Attorney at ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF

09/29/2020 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

09/22/2020 : MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

09/22/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS

09/22/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

09/22/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

DEFAULT

06/24/2020 : DEFAULT

COURT NOTES

06/24/2020 : COURT NOTES

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

06/09/2020 : ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

03/30/2020 : ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

03/26/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/20/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/14/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/13/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/13/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

02/13/2020 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/13/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: (Default)agst Kevin S Harper,$8099.36 Instrument: 2020188171 Book: 7920 Page: 2392

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Onemain Financial Group LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Kevin S Harper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS; Description: by Kristina B Moehle,Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Kevin S Harper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Kevin S Harper by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.; Description: Wednesday June 24, 2020 @9:00AM via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: rescheduled from 4/8/20

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Kevin S Harper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To KEVIN S HARPER fwd to pltfs atty/Max via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Kevin S Harper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Onemain Financial Group LLC etc w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Onemain Financial Group LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREU PALMA LAVIN SOLIS PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant