Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/10/2020 at 00:25:56 (UTC).

OK VICTORIA GARDENS LLLP V. S LEE LLC

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 OK VICTORIA GARDENS LLLP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEE LLC. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LINKHORST & HOCKIN P A

VICTORIA GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

OK VICTORIA GARDENS LLLP

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

S LEE LLC

SUPERIOR DRAFTING & ENGINEERING INC

Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

SUPERIOR DRAFTING & ENGINEERING INC

KH HOLDCO LLC

KOLTER HOMES LLC N K A KH HOLDCO LLC

ALLAN BLOCK CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R SCOTT CLAYTON

Attorney at LINKHORST & HOCKIN P A

4495 Military Trail Ste 106

Jupiter, FL 33458

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY R MOORHEAD

Attorney at WRIGHT FULFORD MOORHEAD & BROWN P A

505 Maitland Ave Ste 1000

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

STEPHEN A BECK

Lee Hernandez Landrum & Carlson 100 Biscayne Blvd Ste 605

Miami, FL 33132

BRIAN R LAMBERT

Attorney at SHUMAKER LOOP & KENDRICK LLP

101 East Kennedy Bkvd Ste 2800

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT

02/11/2020 : RECEIPT

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

02/10/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING

02/10/2020 : NOTICE OF FILING

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/10/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/10/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/10/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS

02/10/2020 : THIRD PARTY SUMMONS

RECEIPT

02/10/2020 : RECEIPT

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

02/10/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/10/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

02/10/2020 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REPLY BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/10/2020 : REPLY BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

02/10/2020 : NOTICE TO PRODUCE

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

02/10/2020 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/10/2020 : NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/10/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/10/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT / ORDER

02/10/2020 : CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT / ORDER

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Superior Drafting & Engineering Inc by OK Victoria Gardens LLLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#141) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Superior Drafting & Engineering Inc by OK Victoria Gardens LLLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#140) Docket Type: MOTION FOR/OF ATTORNEY'S FEES; Description: (3rd party dfnt) Kolter Homes LLC & costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#139) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Stephen A. Beck from Volusia County Clerk of Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#138) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Superior Drafting & Engineering, Inc. from Volusia County Clerk of Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#137) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Timothy R. Moorhead from Volusia County Clerk of Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to R. Scott Clayton from Volusia County Clerk of Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) Docket Type: RECEIPT; Description: of case transfer from Palm Beach County to Volusia County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) Docket Type: ORDER; Description: on Kolter Homes, LLC's etc motion for atty's fees & costs

    Read MoreRead Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: waiver of formal service of process and acceptance of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Timothy R. Moorhead, Esquire obo S. Lee LLC w/ designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RECEIPT; Description: of payment to Palm Beach County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: (issued by Palm Beach County) to S. Lee LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to S. Lee LLC by OK Victoria Gardens, LLLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to S. Lee LLC by OK Victoria Gardens, LLLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT / ORDER; Description: to Volusia County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COURT FILE TRANSFERRED; Description: from Palm Beach County to Volusia County

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINKHORST & HOCKIN P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMBERT , BRIAN R.