Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/29/2020 at 01:17:20 (UTC).

NORMAN KUJAWA V. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 NORMAN KUJAWA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NORMAN KUJAWA

MORGAN & MORGAN P A

Defendants

STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN J JAFFE

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN P A

100 E New York Ave Ste 315

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant Attorneys

DOUGLAS G CAREY

2420 Lakemont Ave Ste 125

Orlando, FL 32814

KEEGAN R SHELBY

Attorney at JAMES A COLEMAN PA

612 E Colonial Drive Ste 250

Orlando, FL 32803

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/25/2020 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/22/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/22/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/22/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE

06/11/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

06/08/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

06/04/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

06/04/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/19/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/10/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/10/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/10/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/10/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/10/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/10/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/10/2020 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

02/10/2020 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/10/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to Advent Health f/k./a Florida Hospital Fish Memorial et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Norman Kujawa by Geico General Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Norman Kujawa by Geico General Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Norman Kujawa by Geico General Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of ans to interrogs by Norman Kujawa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of proposal for settlement by Standard Fire Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of proposal for settlement by Norman Kujawa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of proposal for settlement to Geico General Ins Co by Norman Kujawa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Norman Kujawa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Description: Norman Kujawa (as to The Standard Fire Ins Co)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to The Standard Fire Insurance Company by Norman Kujawa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Geico General Insurance Company by Norman Kujawa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to The Standard Fire Insurance Company by Norman Kujawa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico General Insurance Company by Norman Kujawa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to The Standard Fire Insurance Company by Norman Kujawa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Geico General Insurance Company by Norman Kujawa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Martin J Jaffe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Description: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Standard Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MORGAN & MORGAN PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHELBY KEEGAN R