This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 11/23/2022 at 11:18:46 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC D B A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING V. DERRAL A O NEAL, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 NEWREZ LLC D B A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DERRAL A O NEAL,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary G. Jolley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mary G. Jolley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWREZ LLC D B A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

GILBERT GARCIA GROUP P A

Tampa, FL 33603

MARINOSCI LAW GROUP

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendants

DERRAL A O NEAL

Holly Hill, FL 32117

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DERRAL A O NEAL

Holly Hill, FL 32114

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB

Reston, VA 20190

COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB

UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

Holly Hill, FL 32114

UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

Holly Hill, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMY M KISER

Attorney at GILBERT GARCIA GROUP P A

2313 W Violet St

Tampa, FL 33603

Defendant Attorney

DONNA EVERTZ

Attorney at MARINOSCI LAW GROUP

100 W Cypress Creek Rd Ste 104

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/21/2022 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/12/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

09/19/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/19/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

09/19/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

09/19/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

09/01/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

08/30/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

08/29/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/11/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/11/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/11/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

08/11/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/11/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

08/11/2022 : WORKSHEET

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

08/11/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

08/11/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/11/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27); Docket Type: REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Description: by Newrez LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Derral O'Neal w/affirm defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unknown Tenant #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Derral A ONeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unknown Tenant #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unknown Spouse of Derral A O'Neal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc as Nominee for Countrywide Bank FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: (amd) by NewRez LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Donna Evertz Esq obo Newrez LLC etc & designation of email

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Tenant # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Spouse of Derral A O Neal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Derral A O Neal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: By Newrez LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022192027 Book: 8298 Page: 3559 View: 2022192027

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: By Amy M Kiser Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GILBERT GARCIA GROUP P A is a litigant

Latest cases where MARINOSCI LAW GROUP PC PA is a litigant

Latest cases where Newrez, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Bank, N.A. is a litigant