Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/23/2020 at 01:35:40 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA MR COOPER V. MICHAEL E PHILBRICK, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA MR COOPER filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MICHAEL E PHILBRICK. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael S. Orfinger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael S. Orfinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ & SCHNEID P L

MR COOPER

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA MR COOPER

Defendants

PARTICIA A PHILBRICK

PELICAN BAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF DAYTONA BEACH INC

MICHAEL E PHILBRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEMARIE ANGELLA WILDMAN

Robertson Anschutz & Schneid 6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

03/13/2020 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

03/13/2020 : JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

NOTE, CONTRACT, OR MORTGAGE

03/13/2020 : NOTE, CONTRACT, OR MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF FILING

03/04/2020 : NOTICE OF FILING

HEARING SHEET

02/13/2020 : HEARING SHEET

NOTE, CONTRACT, OR MORTGAGE

01/31/2020 : NOTE, CONTRACT, OR MORTGAGE

ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

01/03/2020 : ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

EXHIBIT LIST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

11/21/2019 : EXHIBIT LIST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

DEFAULT

11/19/2019 : DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

11/18/2019 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/18/2019 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

10/09/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

09/24/2019 : CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/29/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/28/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/28/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

08/28/2019 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

08/28/2019 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: RECEIPT; Description: from records retention for exhibits from hrg/trl dtd 03-13-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: Michael S. Orfinger; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE; Description: against Patricia A Philbrick, et al $220,537.97 Instrument: 2020055510 Book: 7829 Page: 4457

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: NOTE, CONTRACT, OR MORTGAGE; Description: orig Equity Maximizer Agmt, orig mtg, orig modification to equity maximizer agmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: orig docs by US Bank National Assoc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: NON-JURY TRIAL SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS; Description: James Beralus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: aff of costs by Nationstar Mtg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Michael S. Orfinger; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To MICHAEL E. PHILBRICK fwd to pltfs atty and process server (Max) via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Pelican Bay Homeowners Association of Daytona Beach Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Particia A Philbrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Michael E Philbrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper w/NO proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Nationstar, etc w/attached Certification of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2019172470 Book: 7741 Page: 1227

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: for Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MR COOPER is a litigant

Latest cases where Robertson, Anschutz, Schneid & Crane, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEMARIE WILDMAN