This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 05/29/2023 at 13:07:24 (UTC).

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC V. UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL, ETC., ET

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL, ETC , ET. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary G. Jolley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mary G. Jolley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D B A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID CRANE & PARTNERS PLLC

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

JOSEPH VINCENT CONDERCURI JR

Not Classified By Court

JOSEPH V CONDERCURI SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TRACY STARASOLER

MATTHEW E HEARNE

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

JOHN F RUDY III

KEVIN KYLE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET

05/19/2023 : NOTICE OF ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

05/17/2023 : CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/16/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

05/12/2023 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

DEFAULT

05/11/2023 : DEFAULT

HEARING SHEET

05/10/2023 : HEARING SHEET

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/03/2023 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

04/27/2023 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

02/27/2023 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/10/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/10/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

11/10/2021 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/10/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

11/10/2021 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/10/2021 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

WORKSHEET

11/10/2021 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

11/10/2021 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/10/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET; Description: (non jury) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC etc 45mins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Description: of order for judicial default by Nationstar Mortgage LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Nationstar Mortgage LLC etc by The Unkn Heirs etc et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Nationstar Mortgage LLC etc to req for production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to unk heirs etc of estate of Joseph V Conercuri Sr etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Mary G. Jolley; Location: MJZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled; Comments: m/default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Nationstar Mortgage LLC etc by The Unkn Heirs etc et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56); Docket Type: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Description: by Kevin J Kyle Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Joseph Vincent Condercuri Jr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To USA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Heirs etc of Joseph V Condercuri Sr deceased

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Nationstar Mortgage LLC etc of submitting FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) certification w/ note attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: By Nationstar Mortgage LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2021272872 Book: 8154 Page: 2212 View: 2021272872

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less