This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 05/15/2023 at 12:00:38 (UTC).

MSPA CLAIMS 1 LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS ASSIGNEE OF FLORIDA HEALTHCARE PLUS ON, ETC V. HALIFAX HEALTH INC D B A HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 MSPA CLAIMS 1 LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS ASSIGNEE OF FLORIDA HEALTHCARE PLUS ON, ETC filed an Other lawsuit against HALIFAX HEALTH INC D B A HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary G. Jolley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mary G. Jolley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MSPA CLAIMS 1 LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS ASSIGNEE OF FLORIDA HEALTHCARE PLUS ON

FLORIDA HEALTHCARE PLUS

MSP RECOVERY LAW FIRM

RIVERO MESTRE LLP

ARMAS BERTRAN ZINCONE

Defendants

HALIFAX HEALTH INC D B A HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION

HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTINE M LUGO

ANDRES RIVERO

Defendant Attorney

MARIA E ABATE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/18/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/18/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/18/2022 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/18/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

04/18/2022 : STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

04/18/2022 : ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

04/18/2022 : ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

04/18/2022 : NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

04/18/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • Docket(#46); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by MSPA Claims I LLC etc Instrument: 2023092306 Book: 8403 Page: 1212 View: 2023092306

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Mary G. Jolley; Location: MJZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Dfnt's Mtn to Dismiss and Mtn to Strike Class Action Allegations

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • Docket(#45); Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by Halifax Health Inc etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Docket(#44); Docket Type: MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; Description: by Halifax Hospital Medical Center etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • Docket(#43); Docket Type: OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: MSPA Claims LLC to mtn to dismiss and mtn to strike class allegations

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • Docket(#42); Docket Type: COPY OF LAW / CITATION; Description: (Supp) by Halifax Hospital Medical Center etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • Docket(#41); Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: MSPA Claims I LLC of Corrected Statements in the July 15, 2021 joint case mgmt report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • Docket(#39); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38); Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: MSP Recovery Law Firm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Christine Lugo Esq obo MSPA Claims I LLC & designation of email

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR REMOVAL; Description: to District Court by Halifax Health Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Halifax Health Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: to Halifax Health Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Halifax Health Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2.5); Docket Type: CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT / ORDER; Description: transferring to Volusia County (CORRECTED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT / ORDER; Description: transferring to Volusia County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1.5); Docket Type: COURT FILE TRANSFERRED; Description: from Miami-Dade County, #2017-000087-CA-1 (CORRECTED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COURT FILE TRANSFERRED; Description: from Miami-Dade County, #2017-000087-CA-01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less