This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/28/2023 at 19:01:53 (UTC).

MRI ASSOCIATES OF WINTER HAVEN LLC A/A/O LUIS MARTINEZ RIVERA V. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ETC.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 MRI ASSOCIATES OF WINTER HAVEN LLC A/A/O LUIS MARTINEZ RIVERA filed an Other lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ETC. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MRI ASSOCIATES OF WINTER HAVEN LLC A/A/O LUIS MARTINEZ RIVERA

LUIS MARTINEZ RIVERA

DE ARMAS LAW

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENNIFER PEATTIE

Defendant Attorney

PETERSON TAVIL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

03/24/2023 : NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/24/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/24/2023 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/24/2023 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE

03/24/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/17/2023 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/17/2023 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/10/2023 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/10/2023 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/10/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

02/06/2023 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/20/2023 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/17/2023 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/17/2023 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/17/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/10/2023 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/10/2023 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/10/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24); Docket Type: NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Description: of Peterson Tavil Esq obo Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to MRI Associates of Winter Haven LLC etc by Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to MRI Associates of Winter Haven LLC etc by Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to MRI Associates of Winter Haven LLC etc by Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of proposal for settlement by Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: (Supp)Geico General Insurance Co to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico General Insurance Co to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (supp) to Geico General Insurance Company by MRI Associates of Winter Haven LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to MRI Associates of Winter Haven LLC.,etc by Geico General Insurance Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to MRI Associates of Winter Haven LLC.,etc by Geico General Insurance Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Domenico A Tirado,Esq obo Geico General Insurance Company and designation of email address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: Chief Financial Officer obo Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN CORPORATION fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Jennifer Peattie,Esq obo MRI Associates of Winter Haven LLC.,etc and designation of email address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less