This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 12/19/2021 at 13:02:04 (UTC).

MRI ASSOCIATES OF PALM HARBOR INC AAO BREANA KENNEDY V. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 MRI ASSOCIATES OF PALM HARBOR INC AAO BREANA KENNEDY filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MRI ASSOCIATES OF PALM HARBOR INC AAO BREANA KENNEDY

BREANA KENNEDY

JONATHAN DE ARMAS P A

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN R DE ARMAS

Attorney at JONATHAN DE ARMAS PA

222 South Westmonte Drive Suite 227

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/19/2021 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

12/01/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/07/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

12/10/2021 : NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by MRI Associates of Palm Harbor Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO obo State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY,A FOREIGN CORPORATION rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR JAVITZ, RUSSELL is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN R DE ARMAS