Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 06/26/2021 at 13:06:44 (UTC).

MRI ASSOCIATES OF PALM HARBOR INC A A O SHANNON OBYRNE V. SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 MRI ASSOCIATES OF PALM HARBOR INC A A O SHANNON OBYRNE filed an Other lawsuit against SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Belle B. Schumann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Belle B. Schumann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MRI ASSOCIATES OF PALM HARBOR INC A A O SHANNON OBYRNE

SHANNON OBYRNE

DE ARMAS & SERRANO LLP

Defendant

SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN R DE ARMAS

Attorney at DE ARMAS & SERRANO LLP

222 South Westmonte Drive Suite 227

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/22/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

05/28/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/27/2021 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/27/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Belle B. Schumann; Location: BSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Belle B. Schumann; Location: BSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: CFO obo Sentinel Ins Co LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., A FOREIGN CORPORATION forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DE ARMAS & SERRANO PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR JAVITZ, RUSSELL is a litigant

Latest cases where Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN R DE ARMAS