This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 05/21/2023 at 14:27:07 (UTC).

MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC A A O THERESA STONE V. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC A A O THERESA STONE filed an Other lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A. Sanders, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC A A O THERESA STONE

THERESA STONE

DE ARMAS LAW

Defendant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALICIA JESKEY

Defendant Attorney

DOMENIC A TIRADO

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

04/26/2023 : MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

PRE-TRIAL COMPLIANCE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

04/18/2023 : PRE-TRIAL COMPLIANCE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO COMPEL

04/18/2023 : MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF SERVICE

04/12/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

04/04/2023 : ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

02/16/2023 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/15/2023 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/30/2023 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/26/2023 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/26/2023 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/26/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/18/2023 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/18/2023 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/18/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/18/2023 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/12/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

01/09/2023 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/05/2023 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2024
  • DocketSession Type: Jury Trial; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2024
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: CI302, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2024
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: CI302, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled; Comments: PTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: RSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: EXHIBIT; Description: to pltfs m/summary judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by MRI Associates of Lakeland LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL COMPLIANCE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: MRI Associates of Lakeland LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: MOTION TO COMPEL; Description: discovery responses by MRI Associates of Lakeland LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of proposal for settlement by Government Employees Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to MRI Associates of Lakeland LLC.,etc by GEICO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to MRI Associates of Lakeland LLC.,etc by GEICO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Domenico A Tirado,Esq obo Geico Employees Insuarnce Co and designation of email address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO obo Government Employees Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN CORPORATION Fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Alicia Jeskey obo MRI Associates w/designation of email

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less