This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 01/19/2023 at 11:58:06 (UTC).

MORGAN PIERSON V. GABRIEL M ROMAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 MORGAN PIERSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GABRIEL M ROMAN,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORGAN PIERSON

PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & PAUL LLP

Deland, FL 32724

Defendants

GABRIEL M ROMAN

Deland, FL 32724

HOMETEAM PEST DEFENSE

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARREN ELKIND

Attorney at PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & PAUL LLP

142 E New York Ave

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL S LIEBOWITZ

Attorney at CRUSER MITCHELL NOVITZ SANCHEZ GASTEON & ZIMET LLP

121 S Orange Avenue Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR REMOVAL

01/12/2023 : NOTICE OF/FOR REMOVAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE

12/14/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/12/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/12/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/12/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

INTERROGATORIES AND ANSWERS BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/12/2022 : INTERROGATORIES AND ANSWERS BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE

12/12/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

INTERROGATORIES AND ANSWERS BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/12/2022 : INTERROGATORIES AND ANSWERS BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE

12/12/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/24/2022 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/24/2022 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/24/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/24/2022 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/24/2022 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/24/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

08/24/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

08/24/2022 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/24/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR REMOVAL; Description: to District Court by Hometewm Pest Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: verified responses to interrogs by Hometeam Pest Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Morgan Pierson to medicare/medicaid req to produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Morgan Pierson to collateral source req for production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Morgan Pierson to req to produce executed authorizations for social security records

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36); Docket Type: INTERROGATORIES AND ANSWERS BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Morgan Pierson (Medicare/Medicaid)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: answers to medicare/medicaid reporting interrogs by Morgan Pierson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34); Docket Type: INTERROGATORIES AND ANSWERS BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Morgan Pierson (as to collateral source)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: verified answers to collateral source interrogs by Morgan Pierson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Morgan Pierson to req for production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To all named Dfnts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: To Hometeam Pest Defense by Morgan Pierson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: To Hometeam Pest Defense by Morgan Pierson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: To Hometeam Pest Defense by Morgan Pierson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: To Gabriel M Roman by Morgan Pierson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: To Gabriel M Roman by Morgan Pierson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: To Gabriel M Roman by Morgan Pierson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: By Darren J Elkind Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less