Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/16/2020 at 01:57:52 (UTC).

MILTON RODRIGUEZ V. ANCHOR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 MILTON RODRIGUEZ filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ANCHOR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILTON RODRIGUEZ

MOISES GROSS P L L C

Defendant

ANCHOR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESUS DAVID MOISES

Attorney at MOISES TEPLITSKY & GROSS PLLC

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 945

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

DARRYL L GAVIN

Attorney at RUMBERGER KIRK & CALDWELL PA

300 S Orange Ave Ste 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE

08/02/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/18/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

06/18/2020 : MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

05/11/2020 : MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/09/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

04/02/2020 : ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

04/01/2020 : MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/27/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/27/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/19/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/19/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/19/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/17/2019 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/17/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/17/2019 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/17/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

06/17/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

06/17/2019 : COMPLAINT

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of Proposal for settlement to Milton rodriguez by Anchor Property and Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: (3rd) of Corp Rep for Anchor Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Description: by Anchor Property & Casualty Ins Co as to corp rep deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Description: by Anchor Property & Casualty Insurance Company and objection to pltf's re-notice of taking deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Anchor Property and Casualty Ins Co Corp Rep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Description: depo as to Corp Rep cancelled, parties shall reschedule no earlier than 5/1/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Description: by Anchor Property & Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Milton Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Milton Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: (3rd amd) of Corp Rep of Anchor Property

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ANCHOR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf's atty via mail for SOP cc pltf's atty via mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Anchor Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: (video) of rep of Anchor Property and Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Anchor Property and Casualty Ins Co by Milton Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of corp rep of Anchor Property and Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Anchor Property and Casualty Ins Co by Milton Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Jesus Mosies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anchor Property And Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GAVIN DARRYL L