This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/20/2023 at 01:03:40 (UTC).

MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2019 1 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE V. ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST DOROTHY N HILL DECEASED WHO ARE, ET

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2019 1 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST DOROTHY N HILL DECEASED WHO ARE, ET. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2019 1 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE

GILBERT GARCIA GROUP P A

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST DOROTHY N HILL DECEASED WHO ARE

DOROTHY N HILL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DOROTHY N HILL

TARA HILL

MEADOWRIDGE ASSOCIATION INC

Not Classified By Court

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Guardian Ad Litem

HELEN S ROPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMY M KISER

Defendant and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

HELEN M ROPER

FRANK ALEX FORD JR

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/02/2023 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/02/2023 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

02/01/2023 : MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/05/2023 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/29/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

DEFAULT

12/19/2022 : DEFAULT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

12/16/2022 : PROOF OF PUBLICATION

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

12/14/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

12/14/2022 : NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

11/30/2022 : ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

11/29/2022 : OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

11/23/2022 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF ACTION

11/23/2022 : NOTICE OF ACTION

MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AND/OR ATTY AD LITEM

11/17/2022 : MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AND/OR ATTY AD LITEM

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION DILIGENT SEARCH / CONSTRUCTIVE SVC

11/08/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION DILIGENT SEARCH / CONSTRUCTIVE SVC

PROPOSED

11/08/2022 : PROPOSED

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

10/31/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

10/31/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej by Mill City Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-1 etc Instrument: 2023026554 Book: 8366 Page: 2456 View: 2023026554

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42); Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Mill City Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-1 etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket(#41); Docket Type: REPORT OF / BY GUARDIAN AND/OR ATTY AD LITEM; Description: Helen M Roper Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket(#40); Docket Type: ANSWER OF/BY GUARDIAN / ATTY AD LITEM; Description: Helen M Roper obo all unk parties etc agst DOrothy N Hill dcd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Mill City Mortgate Loan Trust to dfnt's Answer w/affirm defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Tara Holloman fka Tara Hill w/affirm defenses to amd complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Meadowridge Assoc Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36); Docket Type: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Meadowridge Association Inc w/prop default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Meadowridge Association, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Tara Hill

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Spouse of Dorothy N Hill

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Any and All Unknown Parties Claiming by, through, under or against Dorothy N. Hill, deceased who are not known to be dead or alive, whether said Unknown Parties may claim interest as spouses etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Mill City Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB w/o prop order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Amy M. Kiser, Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022237131 Book: 8325 Page: 736 View: 2022237131

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: for Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less