Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 05/08/2020 at 19:07:42 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V. TRISTA GREAVES

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRISTA GREAVES. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

TRISTA GREAVES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHAN GREEN

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT

10/08/2019 : DEFAULT

COURT NOTES

10/08/2019 : COURT NOTES

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/20/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/12/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

09/10/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/03/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/03/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

09/03/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/03/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Trista Greaves by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Trisa Greaves

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To TRISTA GREAVES fwd to proc serv/sop (MAX) via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Trista Greaves

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Midland Funding (no order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less