This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 02:00:14 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V. ROCCO BUSCO

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROCCO BUSCO. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ROCCO BUSCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHAN GREEN

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

01/28/2020 : ORDER OF DISMISSAL

COURT NOTES

01/28/2020 : COURT NOTES

COURT NOTES

01/14/2020 : COURT NOTES

ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

01/14/2020 : ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

01/13/2020 : MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/08/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/12/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

11/22/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/20/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/20/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

11/20/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/20/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej Instrument: 2020021891 Book: 7808 Page: 4929

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: (fax)pretrial by Rocco L Busco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Rocco Busco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To ROCCO BUSCO Fwd to Process Server/MAX in office for sop, cc pltfs atty via eservice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Midland Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Rocco Busco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less