Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/13/2020 at 03:43:43 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V. JOHN TREFFILETTI

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHN TREFFILETTI. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JOHN TREFFILETTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTINA B MOEHLE

Attorney at ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/13/2020 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

01/07/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

12/31/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

12/27/2019 : REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/14/2019 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

10/29/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

10/14/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PROPOSED TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

10/08/2019 : PROPOSED TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

10/02/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/25/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/25/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/25/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/25/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: (Alias)John Treffiletti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: ALIAS To JOHN TREFFILETTI fwd to pltf atty for SOP via e-service; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Description: to John Treffiletti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: John Treffiletti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: PROPOSED TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To JOHN TREFFILETTI fwd to pltfs atty/Max via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to John Treffiletti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Midland Funding LLC w/out prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Midland Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREU PALMA LAVIN SOLIS PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B