Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/28/2020 at 10:43:36 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V. JENNIFER GILL SNELL

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JENNIFER GILL SNELL. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JENNIFER GILL SNELL

Edgewater, FL 32141

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHAN GREEN

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/14/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

COURT NOTES

06/23/2020 : COURT NOTES

DEFAULT

06/23/2020 : DEFAULT

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

06/08/2020 : NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

03/30/2020 : ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

03/26/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/20/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/13/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/12/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/12/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

02/12/2020 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/12/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Midland Funding LLC Instrument: 2020128958 Book: 7879 Page: 3165

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: zoom ptc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: by judge as to Jennifer Gill Snell for FTA @ PT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.; Description: (Amd)Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: rescheduled from 4/8/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING; Description: Pre-Trial Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Jennifer Gill-Snell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To JENNIFER GILL-SNELL fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via eservice for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Jennifer Gill-Snell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Midland Funding LLC w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN , JOHAN